OR HB3405 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 220, (2017 Laws): Effective date October 6, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 220, (2017 Laws): Effective date October 6, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Department of Human Services to seek waiver of federal requirements in Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program in order to allow recipients of Supplemental Nutrition Assistance to receive advance installment payments of tax credit for dependent care expenses. Sunsets January 1, 2023. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to payment of dependent care tax credits in installments; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House Committee Do pass and rescind subsequent referral to Revenue (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House Committee Do pass and rescind subsequent referral to Revenue (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-21 | House | Chapter 220, (2017 Laws): Effective date October 6, 2017. |
2017-06-06 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-05-26 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed.Ayes, 25; nays, 1--Linthicum; excused, 4--Olsen, Steiner Hayward, Thatcher, Winters. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Carried over to 05-24 by unanimous consent. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Possible Work Session cancelled. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Human Services. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-04-20 | House | Third reading. Carried by Hayden. Passed.Ayes, 57; Excused, 2--Lininger, McKeown; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Sanchez. |
2017-04-19 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 20, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-18 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 19, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-17 | House | Second reading. |
2017-04-14 | House | Subsequent referral to Revenue rescinded by order of the Speaker. |
2017-04-14 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and subsequent referral to Revenue be rescinded. |
2017-04-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-04-06 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-24 | House | Referred to Human Services and Housing with subsequent referral to Revenue. |
2017-03-22 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |