OR HB3400 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on July 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-08 - Chapter 614, (2015 Laws): Effective date June 30, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on July 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-08 - Chapter 614, (2015 Laws): Effective date June 30, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Makes changes to Ballot Measure 91 (2014). Directs Oregon Health Authority to develop and maintain database of information related to producing and processing of marijuana by persons responsible for marijuana grow sites under Oregon Medical Marijuana Program.] Requires person responsible for marijuana grow site under program to submit to authority certain information related to producing and processing marijuana.] Specifies number of mature marijuana plants that may be produced at single address.] Makes other changes to Oregon Medical Marijuana Act, including changes to harmonize Oregon Medical Marijuana Act with chapter 1, Oregon Laws 2015.] Becomes operative January 1, 2016.] Establishes licensure qualifications for marijuana producers, marijuana processors, marijuana wholesalers and marijuana retailers. Directs Oregon Liquor Control Commission to adopt certain rules related to licensure. Provides commission with additional enforcement powers over licensees, including use of seed to sale tracking system. Directs commission to establish canopy sizes for marijuana producers. Establishes land use law with respect to marijuana producers. Establishes that cannabinoid edibles are subject to laws of this state related to processing food. Requires individuals who perform certain type of work for or on behalf of marijuana retailers to obtain valid permit from commission. Provides for time, place and manner of regulation of licensees by local governments. Authorizes governing body of local governments to refer to electors ordinance under which 3 percent tax may be imposed on sale of marijuana items. Becomes operative January 1, 2016. Makes changes to Oregon Medical Marijuana Act. Limits amount of plants that may be grown at address where marijuana grow sites are located. Requires registration of marijuana processing sites. Requires marijuana grow sites, marijuana processing sites and medical marijuana dispensaries to submit information to Oregon Health Authority related to amount of marijuana held and transferred. Provides for time, place and manner of regulation of registrants by local governments. Becomes operative March 1, 2016. Aligns provisions of Ballot Measure 91 (2014) with provisions of Oregon Medical Marijuana Act. Provides for uniform testing of marijuana items transferred by medical marijuana dispensaries and sold by marijuana retailers. Directs authority to adopt rules related to testing marijuana. Directs authority to accredit laboratories. Directs commission to license laboratories. Becomes operative January 1, 2016. Provides for uniform packaging, labeling and dosage of marijuana items transferred by medical marijuana dispensaries and sold by marijuana retailers. Directs authority to adopt rules related to labeling marijuana items and establishing dosage units for marijuana items. Directs commission to adopt rules related to packaging of marijuana items. Becomes operative January 1, 2016. Provides for certification of private and public researchers of cannabis by commission. Becomes operative November 15, 2015. Reduces crime classifications related to manufacture, delivery and possession of marijuana. Effective on passage. Provides for cannabis education program. Effective on passage. Authorizes local governments, under certain conditions and processes, to adopt ordinances prohibiting establishment of marijuana businesses registered with authority or licensed by commission. Specifies that local government that adopts any such ordinance may not impose any tax on sale of marijuana items. Effective on passage. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to marijuana; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Ann Lininger [D] | Sen. Leslee Beyer [D] | Rep. Andy Olson [R] | Sen. Ginny Burdick [D] |
Sen. Ted Ferrioli [R] | Sen. Jeff Kruse [R] | Sen. Floyd Prozanski [D] | Sen. Elizabeth Steiner Hayward [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-06-15 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-06-15 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-08 | House | Chapter 614, (2015 Laws): Effective date June 30, 2015. |
2015-06-30 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-06-30 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Ferrioli, Burdick. Passed.Ayes, 24; nays, 4--Baertschiger Jr, Johnson, Thomsen, Whitsett; excused, 2--Boquist, Olsen. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Made a Special Order of Business by unanimous consent. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Referred to Implementing Measure 91. |
2015-06-25 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2015-06-24 | House | Third reading. Carried by Lininger, Olson. Passed.Ayes, 52; Nays, 4--Barton, Evans, Hayden, Parrish; Excused, 4--Greenlick, Smith, Sprenger, Weidner. |
2015-06-23 | House | Second reading. |
2015-06-22 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2015-06-15 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-06-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-06-03 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-06-01 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-05-27 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-05-20 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-03-30 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-03-09 | House | Referred to Implementing Measure 91. |
2015-03-02 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |