OR HB3399 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 32-1)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 32-1)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires each public school to provide full-time, in-person classroom instruction during 2021-2022 school year. Requires each public school to provide full-time, in-person classroom instruction during 2021-2022 school year. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2021.
Title
Relating to school opening during COVID-19 declaration of emergency; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - House - House Withdraw from Committee (Y: 20 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-06-03 | House | Motion to withdraw from Rules failed. Ayes, 20; Nays, 36--Alonso Leon, Bynum, Campos, Dexter, Evans, Fahey, Gomberg, Grayber, Helm, Holvey, Hudson, Kropf, Lively, Marsh, McLain, Meek, Nathanson, Neron, Nosse, Pham, Power, Prusak, Rayfield, Reardon, Reynolds, Ruiz, Salinas, Sanchez, Schouten, Smith Warner, Sollman, Speaker Kotek, Valderrama, Wilde, Williams, Witt; Excused, 4--Boshart Davis, Clem, Owens, Wright. |
2021-05-17 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2021-05-10 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |