OR HB3397 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Permits Oregon Health Authority to take steps necessary to ensure that authority pays lowest cost for prescription drugs purchased for recipients of medical assistance, including by entering into agreement with third party to be purchasing agent . Requires] Permits Oregon Health Authority to enter] take steps necessary to ensure that authority pays lowest cost for prescription drugs purchased for recipients of medical assistance, including by entering into agreement with third party to be purchasing agent to assist authority in purchasing prescription drugs for medical assistance recipients]. Establishes Oregon Medicaid Purchasing Cooperative to advise authority, purchasing agent and, with respect to purchasing drugs, Practitioner-Managed Prescription Drug Plan. Requires authority to develop and issue request for proposals for purchasing agent and to be advised by cooperative in selecting purchasing agent. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to prescription drugs; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-25 - House - House Motion to Refer (Y: 37 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-06-25 | House | Motion to refer to Rules carried. Referred. Ayes, 37; Nays, 20--Barreto, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Drazan, Findley, Hayden, Helt, Leif, Lewis, McLane, Nearman, Noble, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Sprenger, Stark, Wallan, Wilson, Zika; Excused, 2--Boles, Clem; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Smith G. |
2019-06-24 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 25, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-06-20 | House | Second reading. |
2019-06-19 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2019-06-14 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-06-10 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2019-06-10 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-05-21 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services. |
2019-04-16 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-04-16 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-04-09 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-04-02 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-26 | House | Referred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2019-03-25 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |