OR HB3394 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes State Gambling Task Force. Establishes State Gambling Task Force. Directs task force to study and make recommendations regarding state gambling policy and regulations. Requires task force to submit periodic reports] interim report on progress to committee of Legislative Assembly and to submit final report to committee by December 1, 2022. Prohibits authorization or implementation of new lottery games or game procedures] playable on mobile device, personal computer or other personal electronic device until January 2, 2023. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to gambling; prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-26HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2021-06-21HouseReferred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
2021-06-21HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means.
2021-06-16HouseWork Session held.
2021-06-03HouseWork Session held.
2021-05-27HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-04-19HouseReferred to Rules.
2021-04-13HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback