OR HB3385 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Oregon Paid Family and Medical Leave Board in Department of Consumer and Business Services. Directs board to develop plan to provide family and medical leave insurance benefits to covered individuals. Requires plan to be financed by employee contributions through payroll deductions at rate determined by board. Requires employers to collect and remit to fund contributions by employees of employer regardless of size of employer. Permits employer to apply for board approval of employer-offered plan to satisfy requirement. Requires Director of Department of Business and Consumer Services to establish system for enforcement and appeal of contested cases involving family and medical leave insurance benefit claims. Requires board to establish plan so that employees can begin contributing to plan no later than January 1, 2021. Requires board to adopt rules for plan and to report annually to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to business and workforce. Requires certain state agencies to collaborate to provide outreach, technical assistance or compliance services to board. Establishes Paid Family and Medical Leave Insurance Fund as trust fund to be used only for specific purposes. Requires moneys collected as contributions to plan from eligible employees to be deposited in fund. Continuously appropriates moneys in fund to department to be used for carrying out duties of board and paying family and medical leave insurance benefits to eligible employees. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to family medical leave benefits; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-03-25 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-19 | House | Referred to Business and Labor with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2019-03-19 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/HB3385 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3385/Introduced |