OR HB3383 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of Human Services to develop pilot program contracting with Yamhill County for provision of community-based child welfare services. Directs department to report annually to interim committees of Legislative Assembly regarding progress of pilot program. Sunsets January 2, 2025. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to community-based child welfare services; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-08 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-15 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-04-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-04-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-27 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-19 | House | Referred to Human Services and Housing with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2019-03-18 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |