OR HB3381 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires prospective contractor to state in bid or proposal for public contract whether and extent to which prospective contractor will use conflict minerals in performing public contract and whether prospective contractor's disclosures, policies, practices and procedures with respect to procuring conflict minerals comply with rules that Securities and Exchange Commission promulgates under provisions of Securities Exchange Act of 1934. Provides that certain statements of prospective contractor are conclusive evidence of disclosures, policies, practices and procedures. Requires contracting agency to give preference to prospective contractor that complies with provisions of Act and permits contracting agency to give additional weight in evaluating bid or proposal to prospective contractor with most thorough description of disclosures, policies, practices and procedures. Becomes operative January 1, 2018. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to prohibitions on public contracting with entities that violated conflict minerals disclosure provisions of the Securities Exchange Act; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-03-13 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2017-03-06 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Measures/Overview/HB3381 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3381/Introduced |