OR HB3379 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 188, (2021 Laws): Effective date June 08, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 188, (2021 Laws): Effective date June 08, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits manufacturing, retrofitting, selling, leasing, subletting or otherwise placing into stream of commerce any crib bumper pads or crib equipped with crib bumper pads. Prohibits manufacturing, retrofitting, selling, leasing, subletting or otherwise placing into stream of commerce any crib bumper pads or crib equipped with crib bumper pads. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to crib bumper pads; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Sheri Malstrom Schouten [D] | Rep. Lisa Reynolds [D] | Sen. Katherine Lieber [D] | Sen. Charles Riley [D] |
Sen. Wlnsvey Campos [D] | Rep. Maxine Dexter [D] | Rep. Courtney Neron [D] | Rep. Rachel Prusak [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 188, (2021 Laws): Effective date June 08, 2021. |
2021-06-08 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-05-27 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Riley. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 2--Heard, Linthicum; Absent, 1--Boquist; Excused, 1--Thatcher. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Labor and Business. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-15 | House | Third reading. Carried by Schouten. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 4--Levy, Morgan, Smith G, Wallan. |
2021-04-14 | House | Carried over to April 15, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-13 | House | Second reading. |
2021-04-09 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-04-07 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-04-05 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-18 | House | Referred to Early Childhood. |
2021-03-16 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |