OR HB3379 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Permits local government or Department of Transportation to license and regulate vehicle-for-hire services and hired drivers. Permits local government or Department of Transportation to license and regulate vehicle-for-hire services and hired drivers. Provides that local government that does not license or regulate vehicle-for-hire service may enter into intergovernmental agreement with department or other local government to accept department's or other local government's license and regulation as local government's own authorization for vehicle-for-hire service. Provides that person may not engage in business as vehicle-for-hire service or provide rides for hire except in accordance with provisions of Act and any rule, ordinance, regulation or other law that applies in jurisdiction in which vehicle-for-hire service operates. Authorizes department and local government to issue license or other authorization to engage in business as vehicle-for-hire service or provide rides for hire and to charge fees for purposes set forth in ordinance, regulation or other law. Requires vehicle-for-hire service to keep certain records and to enter into data-sharing agreement with department, other state agency or local government if department's or other state agency's rule or local government ordinance, regulation or other law requires agreement. Requires individual who applies to become hired driver to submit application with specified information to vehicle-for-hire service. Requires vehicle-for-hire service to forward application to law enforcement agency or other regulatory agency for purpose of conducting criminal background checks. Provides that vehicle-for-hire service may not permit applicant to become hired driver if applicant is not qualified under specified criteria. Specifies automobile insurance coverage requirements for hired drivers and vehicles for hire. Permits insurers to exclude coverage for activities in which individual engages as hired driver. Permits department, for purpose of administering provisions of Act, to impose fee for each ride for hire. Establishes Vehicle for Hire Service Fund. Directs department to deposit fees in fund to be used for administering provisions of Act. Punishes violation of Act as unlawful trade practice under Unlawful Trade Practices Act.] Becomes operative on January 1, 2020. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to requirements for operating vehicles for hire; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Holvey [D] | Sen. Floyd Prozanski [D] | Rep. Margaret Doherty [D] | Rep. John Lively [D] |
Rep. Carla Piluso [D] | Rep. Jeff Reardon [D] | Rep. Marshall Wilde [D] | Sen. Michael Dembrow [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-08 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage, with amendments, and be referred to Revenue, then to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-16 | House | Referred to Revenue then to Ways and Means by order of the Speaker. |
2019-04-16 | House | Without recommendation as to passage, with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Revenue, then Ways and Means. |
2019-04-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-18 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2019-03-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |