OR HB3376 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Chapter 89, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Chapter 89, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that federally recognized Indian tribes in Oregon may apply for grants under emergency preparedness equipment grant program.
Title
Relating to emergency preparedness equipment grant program.
Sponsors
Rep. Tawna Sanchez [D] | Rep. Caddy McKeown [D] | Rep. Paul Evans [D] | Rep. Julianne Fahey [D] |
Sen. Laurie Monnes Anderson [D] | Sen. Rob Wagner [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | House | Chapter 89, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020. |
2019-05-07 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-30 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Monnes Anderson. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Riley, Winters. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-04-04 | House | Third reading. Carried by Sanchez. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 2--Keny-Guyer, McKeown; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Smith Warner, Williamson. |
2019-04-03 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 4, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-04-02 | House | Second reading. |
2019-04-01 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-03-26 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness. |
2019-03-04 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |