OR HB3374 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Replaces references to vehicle accident and vehicle collision with vehicle crash. Replaces references to vehicle accident and vehicle collision with vehicle crash.
Title
Relating to vehicle crashes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-03-23 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-03-03 | House | Referred to Transportation. |
2023-02-28 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |