OR HB3372 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 307, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 307, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes Department of Environmental Quality to require certain information related to history of compliance with environmental quality laws from applicant for license or permit. Authorizes Department of Environmental Quality to require certain information related to history of compliance with environmental quality laws from applicant for license or permit. Modifies authority of department to refuse to issue, modify, suspend, revoke or refuse to renew permit. Modifies authority of department to refuse to issue, suspend or revoke asbestos abatement license. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to environmental quality; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Tina Kotek [D] | Sen. Wlnsvey Campos [D] | Rep. Maxine Dexter [D] | Rep. Dacia Grayber [D] |
Rep. Paul Holvey [D] | Rep. Robert Nosse [D] | Rep. Karin Power [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 46 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 307, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021. |
2021-06-15 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-03 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 46; Nays, 10--Bonham, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Hayden, Morgan, Nearman, Post, Reschke, Stark, Wallan; Excused, 4--Boshart Davis, Clem, Owens, Wright. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Findley. Passed. Ayes, 23; Nays, 6--Boquist, Girod, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Heard. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Energy and Environment. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-16 | House | Third reading. Carried by Speaker Kotek. Passed. Ayes, 43; Nays, 8--Bonham, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Hayden, Post, Reschke, Stark, Wright; Excused, 6--Levy, Lively, Morgan, Nearman, Reynolds, Wallan; Excused for Business of the House, 3--Boshart Davis, Nosse, Rayfield. |
2021-04-15 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 16, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-14 | House | Second reading. |
2021-04-10 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-04-07 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-22 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-16 | House | Referred to Energy and Environment. |
2021-03-15 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |