OR HB3372 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 277, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 277, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires coordinated care organization to provide initial health assessment on child enrolled in coordinated care organization no later than 60 days after date that Oregon Health Authority notifies coordinated care organization that child has been taken into custody of Department of Human Services. Requires coordinated care organization to locate child and arrange initial health assessment if child has not received initial health assessment in 60-day period. Requires coordinated care organization to report data specified by authority regarding barriers to coordinated care organizations' ability to comply with requirements. Requires authority to report to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to health on rate of compliance by each coordinated care organization and steps taken to improve rates of compliance.
Title
Relating to coordinated care organizations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-30 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-21 | House | Chapter 277, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018. |
2017-06-08 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-01 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-30 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 60. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed.Ayes, 26; excused, 4--Olsen, Steiner Hayward, Thatcher, Winters. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Carried over to 05-24 by unanimous consent. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Human Services. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-04-27 | House | Third reading. Carried by Sanchez. Passed.Ayes, 52; Excused, 6--Barker, Bynum, Heard, Kennemer, McLain, Smith G; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Evans, Speaker Kotek. |
2017-04-26 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 27, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-25 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 26, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-24 | House | Second reading. |
2017-04-20 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2017-04-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-04-06 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-13 | House | Referred to Human Services and Housing. |
2017-03-06 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |