OR HB3367 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires business entity that receives public funds from state agency to develop and submit emergency preparedness plan to Secretary of State along with annual report. Requires business entity that receives public funds from state agency to develop and submit emergency preparedness plan to Secretary of State along with annual report. Provides that Secretary of State's duty with respect to emergency preparedness plan is ministerial. Permits state agency that provides public funds to business entity to condition provision of public funds on business entity's submitting emergency preparedness plan to Secretary of State. Permits state agency to evaluate adequacy of emergency preparedness plan under specified standard. Becomes operative January 1, 2024. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to emergency preparedness plans for business entities that receive public funds; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-25HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2023-03-03HouseReferred to Emergency Management, General Government, and Veterans.
2023-02-28HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback