OR HB3363 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Chapter 409, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Chapter 409, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Changes term "osteopath" to "osteopathic physician." Clarifies that doctors of osteopathic medicine practice medicine as physicians.
Title
Relating to doctors of osteopathic medicine.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-28 | House | Chapter 409, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018. |
2017-06-20 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-06-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Beyer. Passed.Ayes, 30. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Carried over to 06-06 by unanimous consent. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-04-18 | House | Third reading. Carried by Noble. Passed.Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Greenlick, Sprenger. |
2017-04-17 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 18, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-13 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 17, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-12 | House | Second reading. |
2017-04-11 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2017-04-07 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-03-29 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-13 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2017-03-06 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |