OR HB3359 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-09 - Referred to Judiciary.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes Task Force on Digital Rights. Establishes Task Force on Digital Rights. Sets forth duties of task force. Requires task force to submit report to interim committee of Legislative Assembly related to business development no later than September 15, 2022. Sunsets December 31, 2022. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to digital rights; prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-09HouseReferred to Judiciary.
2021-03-02HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback