OR HB3353 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-9)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 467, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires Oregon Health Authority to seek federal approval of amendment to state Medicaid demonstration project to permit coordinated care organizations to use portion of global budgets to improve health equity, improve overall health of community or enhance payments to providers who advance health equity or provide services improving overall health of community and to allow such expenditures to be counted as medical expenses in coordinated care organization's base medical budget and in calculation of global budget and flexible spending for given year. Requires Oregon Health Authority to seek federal approval of amendment to state Medicaid demonstration project to permit coordinated care organizations to use portion of global budgets to improve health equity, improve overall health of community or enhance payments to providers who advance health equity or provide services improving overall health of community and to allow such expenditures to be counted as medical expenses for purposes of required medical loss ratio] in coordinated care organization's base medical budget and in calculation of global budget and flexible spending for given year. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to health care expenditures; and prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-11 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-25HouseChapter 467, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
2021-07-14HouseGovernor signed.
2021-06-26SenatePresident signed.
2021-06-24HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-06-23SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Heard.
2021-06-23SenateThird reading. Carried by Lieber. Passed. Ayes, 19; Nays, 10--Boquist, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Kennemer, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Manning Jr.
2021-06-22SenateSecond reading.
2021-06-22SenateRecommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill.
2021-06-21SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2021-06-21SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2021-06-17HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Nosse. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 2--Morgan, Stark.
2021-06-17HouseSecond reading.
2021-06-15HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
2021-06-11HouseWork Session held.
2021-06-10HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2021-06-10HouseWork Session held.
2021-06-03HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Human Services.
2021-04-19HouseReferred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
2021-04-19HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means.
2021-04-13HouseWork Session held.
2021-04-06HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-03-09HouseReferred to Health Care.
2021-03-02HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB3353
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3353/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3353/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3353/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3353/House%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3353/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3353/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/32072
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/32907
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=531712
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=533014

Bill Comments

feedback