OR HB3352 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 554, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 554, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Renames Health Care for All Oregon Children program as Cover All People program and expands eligibility to adults who would qualify for Medicaid-funded state medical assistance program but for their immigration status. Renames Health Care for All Oregon Children program as Cover All People program and expands eligibility to adults who would qualify for Medicaid-funded state medical assistance program but for their immigration status. Allows Oregon Health Authority to restrict eligibility to specific categories or groups of individuals to stay within legislative appropriation for this biennium. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to access to health care; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 554, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021. |
2021-07-19 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-29 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Steiner Hayward. Passed. Ayes, 17; Nays, 11--Anderson, Boquist, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Kennemer, Knopp, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Heard, Manning Jr. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-06-25 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-06-24 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Campos. Passed. Ayes, 37; Nays, 21--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Drazan, Hayden, Leif, Levy, Lewis, Moore-Green, Morgan, Noble, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Stark, Wallan, Weber, Wright, Zika; Excused, 1--Smith G. |
2021-06-24 | House | Second reading. |
2021-06-23 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2021-06-22 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-06-21 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-06-21 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-06-18 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. |
2021-04-28 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2021-04-28 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-04-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-16 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2021-03-02 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |