OR HB3348 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-01 - Chapter 603, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-01 - Chapter 603, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires financial estimate committee to file statement "MEASURE SPENDS MONEY WITHOUT IDENTIFYING A FUNDING SOURCE" with Secretary of State upon finding that ballot measure with no dedicated funding source will have financial effect on public expenditures in excess of $100,000. Requires statement to be printed in voters' pamphlet.
Title
Relating to disclosure of financial impact of ballot measures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-01 | House | Chapter 603, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020. |
2019-07-23 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-07-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-07-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-30 | Senate | Gelser, excused, granted unanimous consent to vote aye. |
2019-06-30 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 24; Nays, 4--Baertschiger Jr, Hansell, Olsen, Thomsen; Absent, 2--Girod, Linthicum. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-05-22 | House | Third reading. Carried by Nathanson. Passed. Ayes, 52; Nays, 5--Findley, Nearman, Post, Reschke, Wallan; Absent, 1--Power; Excused, 2--Boles, Helm. |
2019-05-21 | House | Carried over to May 22, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-20 | House | Second reading. |
2019-05-17 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-05-16 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-05-15 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2019-03-04 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |