OR HB3347 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes State Fish and Wildlife Commission to establish by rule annual and daily Willamette River salmon, steelhead and sturgeon recreational fishing endorsements. Authorizes State Fish and Wildlife Commission to establish by rule annual and daily Willamette River salmon, steelhead and sturgeon recreational fishing endorsements. Requires that fees collected for endorsements be deposited in Willamette River Fisheries Enhancement Fund. Establishes Willamette River Fisheries Enhancement Fund in State Treasury, separate and distinct from General Fund. Continuously appropriates moneys in Willamette River Fisheries Enhancement Fund to State Department of Fish and Wildlife to implement measures that enhance fisheries, optimize economic benefits of fisheries and advance native fish conservation. Establishes Willamette River Endorsements Board within department. Directs board to determine uses of moneys in Willamette River Fisheries Enhancement Fund.
Title
Relating to Willamette River fishing endorsements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-03-23 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources. |
2021-03-02 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB3347 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3347/Introduced |