OR HB3345 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends statute of limitations for certain sex crimes. Extends statute of limitations for certain sex crimes. Authorizes prosecution at any time after commission of crime if defendant identified based on DNA analysis. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to statute of limitations; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Helfrich [R] | Rep. Court Boice [R] | Rep. Jami Cate [R] | Rep. James Hieb [R] |
Rep. Cyrus Javadi [R] | Rep. Kevin Mannix [R] | Rep. Mark Owens [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-03-13 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-02-23 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2023-02-21 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |