OR HB3344 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires health care providers to include CPT codes in bills sent to consumers and insurers. Requires insurers to include CPT codes in explanation of benefit notices.
Title
Relating to health care provider billing.
Sponsors
Sen. Janeen Sollman [D] | Rep. Paul Evans [D] | Rep. Mitch Greenlick [D] | Rep. Rachel Prusak [D] |
Rep. Andrea Salinas [D] | Rep. Anna Williams [D] | Rep. Joseph Zika [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-06-11 | House | Informational Meeting held. |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2019-03-04 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/HB3344 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3344/Introduced |