OR HB3344 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-29 - Chapter 695, (2013 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-29 - Chapter 695, (2013 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Extends time frame for elector to verify challenged ballot from 10 days to 14 days.
Title
Relating to challenged ballots.
Sponsors
Rep. Val Hoyle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-29 | House | Chapter 695, (2013 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2014. |
2013-07-29 | House | Governor signed. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-07-01 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Burdick. Passed. Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Dingfelder, Edwards. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2013-06-24 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-06-21 | House | Third reading. Carried by Hoyle. Passed. Ayes, 48; Nays, 11--Cameron, Freeman, Gilliam, Hicks, Johnson, Kennemer, McLane, Parrish, Sprenger, Weidner, Whitsett; Excused, 1--Hanna. |
2013-06-20 | House | Second reading. |
2013-06-19 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2013-06-17 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-03-11 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-04 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2013-02-25 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |