OR HB3343 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires person that provides mental health care or services to prevent substance abuse to make certain disclosures in any advertisement for or following any communication regarding person's services or facilities. Prohibits person from paying or accepting compensation for referring or referral of resident of this state for mental health care or services to prevent substance abuse. Provides that failure to comply with or violation of Act is unlawful practice under Unlawful Trade Practices Act. Becomes operative on January 1, 2020. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to communications by persons that provide certain treatments to residents of this state; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2019-03-04 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/HB3343 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3343/Introduced |