OR HB3341 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides process and form by which associations may amend declarations and bylaws of planned community or condominium to remove unlawfully discriminatory provisions. Provides process and form by which associations may amend declarations and bylaws of planned community or condominium to remove unlawfully discriminatory provisions. Extends until December 31, 2024, deadline by which associations must review declarations and bylaws. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to housing; prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-25HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2023-02-28HouseReferred to Housing and Homelessness.
2023-02-21HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback