OR HB3338 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Passed on July 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-13 - Chapter 437, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Passed on July 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-13 - Chapter 437, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires State Department of Agriculture to adopt rules governing posting of tax information by gas stations. Authorizes Director of Agriculture to impose civil penalty for violation of statute governing posting of tax information by gas stations.
Title
Relating to the posting of tax information by gas stations.
Sponsors
Sen. Dallas Heard [R] | Rep. Brian Clem [D] | Rep. Bradley Witt [D] | Rep. Jeff Barker [D] |
Rep. Janelle Bynum [D] | Rep. Margaret Doherty [D] | Rep. Paul Evans [D] | Rep. David Gomberg [D] |
Sen. Chris Gorsek [D] | Rep. Ken Helm [D] | Sen. Mark Meek [D] | Rep. Robert Nosse [D] |
Rep. Bill Post [R] | Rep. Jeff Reardon [D] | Sen. David Smith [R] | Sen. Janeen Sollman [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-12 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Revenue by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Revenue by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-13 | House | Chapter 437, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018. |
2017-06-22 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-06-15 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-14 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-12 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 53; Excused, 7--Bentz, Boone, Helm, McLane, Noble, Smith G, Witt. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Baertschiger Jr. Passed.Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Boquist, Gelser. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-05-16 | House | Third reading. Carried by Heard. Passed.Ayes, 56; Excused, 3--Boone, Greenlick, McKeown; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Olson. |
2017-05-15 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 16, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-11 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 15, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-10 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 11, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-09 | House | Second reading. |
2017-05-08 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-05-02 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-04-26 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-04-21 | House | Referred to Revenue by prior reference. |
2017-04-21 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Revenue by prior reference. |
2017-04-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-04-13 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-13 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources with subsequent referral to Revenue. |
2017-03-07 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |