OR HB3336 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that use of certain name other than name displayed on government-issued identification document does not constitute crime of giving false information to a peace officer in connection with a citation or warrant.
Title
Relating to giving false information to a peace officer.
Sponsors
Rep. Diego Hernandez [D] | Rep. Brian Clem [D] | Rep. Mitch Greenlick [D] | Rep. Susan McLain [D] |
Rep. Karin Power [D] | Rep. Jennifer Williamson [D] | Sen. Shemia Fagan [D] | Sen. Lew Frederick [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-03-25 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-03-04 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/HB3336 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3336/Introduced |