OR HB3331 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-29 - Chapter 694, (2013 Laws): Effective date July 29, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-29 - Chapter 694, (2013 Laws): Effective date July 29, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Directs Department of State Police to establish Voluntary Central Criminal Records Check Registry.
Title
Relating to criminal records checks; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-29 | House | Chapter 694, (2013 Laws): Effective date July 29, 2013. |
2013-07-29 | House | Governor signed. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-07-01 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Whitsett. Passed. Ayes, 27; excused, 3--Boquist, Dingfelder, Edwards. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-06-24 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-06-21 | House | Third reading. Carried by Nathanson. Passed. Ayes, 58; Nays, 1--Whitsett; Excused, 1--Hanna. |
2013-06-20 | House | Second reading. |
2013-06-20 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2013-06-19 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-06-06 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2013-06-06 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-05-21 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-05-07 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On General Government. |
2013-04-16 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2013-04-16 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2013-04-11 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-03-21 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-01 | House | Referred to Consumer Protection and Government Efficiency with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2013-02-25 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |