OR HB3327 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends sunset for authorization to Department of Justice to assist victims of domestic violence and sexual assault with housing needs until January 2, 2024. Extends sunset for authorization to Department of Justice to assist victims of domestic violence and sexual assault with housing needs until January 2, 2024. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to department for those purposes. Requires department to report on expenditures to interim committee of Legislative Assembly on or before September 15, 2022. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2021.
Title
Relating to housing assistance for victims; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Leif [R] | Rep. Jason Kropf [D] | Rep. Teresa Alonso Leon [D] | Rep. Janelle Bynum [D] |
Rep. Ronald Noble [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-13 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-04-20 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-04-20 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-04-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred to Judiciary with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2021-03-02 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |