OR HB3324 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Oregon Vehicle Industry Board. Establishes Oregon Vehicle Industry Board. Transfers duties, functions and powers of Department of Transportation related to regulation of vehicle dealers and dismantlers to Oregon Vehicle Industry Board. Becomes operative on January 1, 2022. Repeals Oregon Dealer Advisory Committee. Becomes operative on January 1, 2024. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to the Oregon Vehicle Industry Board; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Evans [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-04-22 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-15 | House | Public Hearing cancelled. |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred to Transportation with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2021-03-02 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB3324 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3324/Introduced |