OR HB3322 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-5)
Status: Enrolled on June 3 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Allows production of food in planned community by lot owners and their tenants. Allows production of food in planned community by lot owners and their tenants. Declares emergency, effective on passage.].

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to producing food in planned communities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-03SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Heard.
2021-06-03SenateManning Jr declared potential conflict of interest.
2021-06-03SenateThird reading. Carried by Patterson. Bill failed. Ayes, 14; Nays, 13--Beyer, Findley, Girod, Gorsek, Hansell, Heard, Johnson, Knopp, Lieber, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 3--Boquist, Kennemer, Taylor.
2021-06-02SenateSecond reading.
2021-06-02SenateRecommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
2021-05-25SenateWork Session held.
2021-05-11SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-04-29SenateReferred to Housing and Development.
2021-04-28SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2021-04-26HouseThird reading. Carried by Hayden. Passed. Ayes, 53; Nays, 2--Fahey, Rayfield; Excused, 4--Hudson, Leif, Nearman, Noble; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek.
2021-04-20HouseCarried over to April 26, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-04-19HouseSecond reading.
2021-04-15HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2021-04-13HouseWork Session held.
2021-04-06HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-03-09HouseReferred to Housing.
2021-03-02HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback