OR HB3318 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-30 - Chapter 552, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires, if certain conditions are met, Department of Land Conservation and Development to approve City of Bend's expansion of urban growth boundary to include specified lands and allows department to approve other land use regulations for those lands. Requires, if certain conditions are met, Department of Land Conservation and Development to approve City of Bend's expansion of urban growth boundary to include specified lands and allows department to approve other land use regulations for those lands. Sunsets provisions on January 2, 2030. Exempts dog training facilities from state structural specialty codes. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to use of land; and prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-26 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 41 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-30HouseChapter 552, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
2021-07-19HouseGovernor signed.
2021-06-30SenatePresident signed.
2021-06-29HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-06-26HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 41; Nays, 14--Campos, Dexter, Fahey, Gomberg, Helm, Holvey, Marsh, McLain, Nathanson, Pham, Rayfield, Salinas, Sanchez, Sollman; Excused, 4--Hayden, Morgan, Smith G, Weber.
2021-06-25SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Knopp. Passed. Ayes, 25; Nays, 2--Boquist, Robinson; Excused, 3--Heard, Manning Jr, Thatcher.
2021-06-25SenateSecond reading.
2021-06-25SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
2021-06-25SenateWork Session held.
2021-06-24SenateWork Session cancelled.
2021-06-22SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-06-21SenateReferred to Rules.
2021-06-21SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2021-06-21HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Kropf. Passed. Ayes, 42; Nays, 16--Campos, Cate, Dexter, Gomberg, Hayden, Helm, Hudson, McLain, Nathanson, Pham, Rayfield, Salinas, Sanchez, Valderrama, Williams, Witt; Excused, 1--Prusak.
2021-06-21HouseSecond reading.
2021-06-17HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2021-06-15HouseWork Session held.
2021-06-14HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-03-09HouseReferred to Rules.
2021-03-02HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB3318
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3318/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3318/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3318/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3318/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3318/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3318/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/32943
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=532336
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/33221
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=534078
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=534627

Bill Comments 750

feedback