OR HB3317 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes Wallowa Rural and Recreational Economic Development Board. Establishes Wallowa Rural and Recreational Economic Development Board. Directs board to, in collaboration with Oregon Business Development Department, formulate and implement strategies and practices for strategic investment in workforce housing, workforce development and economic development in Wallowa Rural and Recreational Economic Development Region and to make grants or loans to eligible applicants in region. Sets forth duties, functions and responsibilities of department and board. Allows county to partition and rezone up to 50 acres of lands within region from resource use to residential uses. Sunsets January 2, 2035. Establishes Wallowa Rural and Recreational Economic Development Board Fund and continuously appropriates moneys to department for distribution to board for purposes set forth in Act. Appropriates moneys to department for deposit in fund. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to Wallowa Rural and Recreational Economic Development Region; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-30 - House - House Committee Do pass. Refer to Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-25HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2023-04-05HouseReferred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
2023-04-05HouseRecommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means.
2023-03-30HouseWork Session held.
2023-03-23HousePublic Hearing held.
2023-02-23HouseReferred to Economic Development and Small Business.
2023-02-21HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/Overview/HB3317
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3317/Introduced
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/76689
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/74409
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/76599
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/267007
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/266759
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/267733
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/267842
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/267799
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/268467
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/268566
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/268565
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/77495
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/34957

Bill Comments

feedback