OR HB3317 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts from ad valorem property taxation machinery and equipment used to compress and bale harvested straw, hay, grass or other plants. Exempts from ad valorem property taxation machinery and equipment used to compress and bale harvested straw, hay, grass or other plants. Applies to property tax years beginning on or after July 1, 2021. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to a property tax exemption for farm machinery; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Clem [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-03-25 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-23 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2021-03-02 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB3317 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3317/Introduced |