OR HB3315 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - Public Hearing and Possible Work Session scheduled.
Pending: House Wildfire Recovery Committee
Hearing: May 21 @ 10:00 am in Remote C
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Directs Housing and Community Services Department to study issues relating to building in areas affected by wildfires and report to appropriate committee or interim committee of Legislative Assembly on or before September 15, 2022. Directs Housing and Community Services Department to study issues relating to building in areas affected by wildfires and report to appropriate committee or interim committee of Legislative Assembly on or before September 15, 2022. Sunsets December 31, 2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to building in areas affected by wildfires.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-21HousePublic Hearing and Possible Work Session scheduled.
2021-03-09HouseReferred to Wildfire Recovery.
2021-03-02HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback