OR HB3315 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-13 - Chapter 389, (2013 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-13 - Chapter 389, (2013 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Employment Department to report employer contracting for forest maintenance activity on federal forestland if employer is not in compliance with federal requirements for temporary employment certification.
Title
Relating to forestland employment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-13 | House | Chapter 389, (2013 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2014. |
2013-06-13 | House | Governor signed. |
2013-06-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-06-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Hansell. Passed. Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Baertschiger. |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-05-28 | House | Third reading. Carried by Whisnant. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused for Business of the House, 1--McKeown. |
2013-05-23 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 28, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-05-22 | House | Second reading. |
2013-05-21 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2013-05-17 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-05-14 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2013-05-14 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-04-29 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development. |
2013-04-23 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2013-04-23 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2013-04-17 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-04-05 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-04 | House | Referred to Business and Labor with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2013-02-25 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |