OR HB3308 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-22 - Chapter 741, (2015 Laws): Effective date July 20, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-22 - Chapter 741, (2015 Laws): Effective date July 20, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Higher Education Coordinating Commission to convene work group to analyze and make recommendations on how to address disparities in higher education among traditionally marginalized, underserved and underrepresented communities. Requires work group to submit report detailing analysis and recommendations to interim legislative committees on higher education by June 30, 2016. Sunsets work group on December 31, 2017. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to underrepresented communities in higher education; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2015-06-30 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 42 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-22 | House | Chapter 741, (2015 Laws): Effective date July 20, 2015. |
2015-07-20 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-07-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-07-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-06-30 | House | Rules suspended. House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 42; Nays, 16--Barreto, Esquivel, Gilliam, Hayden, Heard, Johnson, Kennemer, Krieger, Nearman, Post, Smith, Sprenger, Stark, Weidner, Whitsett, Wilson; Excused, 2--Gorsek, Greenlick. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Monroe. Passed.Ayes, 21; nays, 6--Boquist, Hansell, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen, Whitsett; excused, 3--Devlin, Girod, President Courtney. |
2015-06-26 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-06-19 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2015-06-19 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Education. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2015-04-16 | House | Third reading. Carried by Gallegos. Passed.Ayes, 39; Nays, 18--Barreto, Buehler, Esquivel, Gilliam, Hayden, Heard, Johnson, Kennemer, Krieger, Nearman, Olson, Post, Smith, Stark, Weidner, Whisnant, Whitsett, Wilson; Excused, 3--Clem, McLane, Piluso. |
2015-04-15 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 16, 2015 Calendar. |
2015-04-14 | House | Second reading. |
2015-04-13 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2015-04-10 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-03-25 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-03-23 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-03-04 | House | Referred to Higher Education, Innovation, and Workforce Development. |
2015-02-27 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |