OR HB3306 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows landlord and tenant to agree to recurring charge in lieu of security deposit. Allows landlord and tenant to agree to recurring charge in lieu of security deposit. Establishes requirements of agreement.
Title
Relating to charges in lieu of security deposit.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Meek [D] | Rep. Joseph Zika [R] | Rep. Bradley Witt [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-04-01 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred to Housing. |
2021-03-02 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB3306 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3306/Introduced |