OR HB3305 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Includes travel trailers as vehicles that are subject to state's "lemon law." Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to enforcing warranties for new vehicles; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-14 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-14 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-04-24 | House | Third reading. Carried by Stark. Passed.Ayes, 44; Nays, 12--Barreto, Bentz, Esquivel, Huffman, Johnson, Kennemer, Nearman, Noble, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Whisnant; Excused, 4--Alonso Leon, Boone, Gorsek, Smith G. |
2017-04-20 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 24, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-19 | House | Second reading. |
2017-04-18 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2017-04-14 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-03-15 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2017-03-02 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |