OR HB3297 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Imposes mandatory per-mile road usage charge for registered owners and lessees of passenger vehicles of model year 2028 or later that have rating of 30 miles per gallon or greater, beginning July 1, 2027, and then of passenger vehicles of model year 2036 or later that have rating of 20 miles per gallon or greater, beginning July 1, 2035. Imposes mandatory per-mile road usage charge for registered owners and lessees of passenger vehicles of model year 2028 or later that have rating of 30 miles per gallon or greater, beginning July 1, 2027, and then of passenger vehicles of model year 2036 or later that have rating of 20 miles per gallon or greater, beginning July 1, 2035. Repeals voluntary per-mile road usage charge on July 1, 2030. Allows annual fee in lieu of mandatory per-mile road usage charge. Provides that vehicles otherwise exempted from certain state registration fees remain liable for registration fees imposed by district or county. Requires Department of Transportation to submit three biennial reports to Road User Fee Task Force about development and implementation of mandatory per-mile road usage charge, presenting findings of studies to consider certain technical issues and policy goals. Requires department to seek federal funding to better understand interaction of per-mile road usage charges and impact on environment of motor vehicle usage. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to motor vehicle charges; prescribing an effective date; providing for revenue raising that requires approval by a three-fifths majority.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-25HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2023-05-11HousePublic Hearing held.
2023-02-23HouseReferred to Transportation with subsequent referral to Revenue.
2023-02-21HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback