OR HB3296 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases privilege taxes imposed upon manufacturer or importing distributor of malt beverages, wine or cider. Increases privilege taxes imposed upon manufacturer or importing distributor of malt beverages, wine or cider. Provides for distribution of portion of increased revenues to Oregon Health Authority for purpose of funding behavioral health and substance use programs. Holds harmless cities and counties currently receiving distributions of tax revenues from malt beverages, wine or cider. Establishes Addiction Crisis Recovery Fund. Prescribes uses of fund. Requires revenues from increased taxes to be deposited in fund. Requires biennial increase of markup prices for distilled liquor sold in state. Requires amounts due to increase to be deposited in fund. Revises distribution amounts from Oregon Liquor Control Commission Account. Applies to manufacture or distribution of malt beverages, wine or cider occurring on or after January 1, 2022. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to revenues derived from sale of alcoholic beverages; prescribing an effective date; providing for revenue raising that requires approval by a three-fifths majority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-03-02 | House | Referred to Behavioral Health with subsequent referral to Revenue, then Ways and Means. |
2021-02-23 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB3296 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3296/Introduced |