OR HB3294 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on July 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-26 - Chapter 342, (2023 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on July 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-26 - Chapter 342, (2023 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires county clerk to replace recorded instrument with court-ordered version that redacts discriminatory language. Requires county clerk to replace recorded instrument with court-ordered version that redacts discriminatory language. Makes changes to court process for reviewing language. Requires Judicial Department to update form of petition, notice and judgment] order.
Title
Relating to removal of discriminatory language from recorded instruments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-26 | House | Chapter 342, (2023 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2024. |
2023-07-18 | House | Governor signed. |
2023-06-24 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-06-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-06-22 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Findley. |
2023-06-22 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Manning Jr. Passed. Ayes, 23; Nays, 1--Bonham; Absent, 6--Boquist, Hansell, Hayden, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher. |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Carried over to 06-22 by unanimous consent. |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Carried over to 06-21 by unanimous consent. |
2023-06-16 | Senate | Carried over to 06-20 by unanimous consent. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Second reading. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2023-04-14 | House | Third reading. Carried by Nguyen D. Passed. Ayes, 43; Excused, 17--Boshart Davis, Elmer, Goodwin, Helfrich, Hieb, Javadi, Levy B, McIntire, Nathanson, Osborne, Owens, Pham H, Reschke, Reynolds, Sosa, Wallan, Wright. |
2023-04-13 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 14, 2023 Calendar. |
2023-04-12 | House | Second reading. |
2023-04-11 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2023-04-04 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-03-09 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-02-23 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2023-02-21 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |