OR HB3293 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 129, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 129, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes provider of water project support to make support available to local organizations and local governments for purpose of developing local community engagement plans for water projects. Authorizes provider of water project support to make support available to local organizations and local governments for purpose of developing local community engagement plans for water projects. Allows provider to condition support for community engagement on local organization or local government use of provider-recognized best practices related to equitable and meaningful participation in water project planning and decision-making process. Requires provider of water project support to periodically coordinate with other providers to update and ensure uniform application of best practices regarding community engagement planning.
Title
Relating to water project community engagement.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Reardon [D] | Rep. Gary Leif [R] | Rep. Mark Owens [R] | Sen. David Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 129, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022. |
2021-06-01 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-05-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Patterson. Passed. Ayes, 23; Nays, 6--Boquist, Girod, Heard, Linthicum, Robinson, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Thatcher. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources and Wildfire Recovery. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-16 | House | Third reading. Carried by Reardon. Passed. Ayes, 54; Excused, 6--Levy, Lively, Morgan, Nearman, Reynolds, Wallan. |
2021-04-15 | House | Second reading. |
2021-04-13 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-04-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-16 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-02 | House | Referred to Water. |
2021-02-23 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |