OR HB3289 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Chapter 404, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Chapter 404, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Higher Education Coordinating Commission to submit annual report to interim committees of Legislative Assembly that describes progress made in providing competency-based education in public post-secondary institutions of education.
Title
Relating to competency-based education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the bill and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the bill and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-28 | House | Chapter 404, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018. |
2017-06-20 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-06-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Linthicum. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Monnes Anderson. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-04-20 | House | Third reading. Carried by Whisnant. Passed.Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Lininger, McKeown. |
2017-04-19 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 20, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-18 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 19, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-17 | House | Second reading. |
2017-04-14 | House | Subsequent referral to Ways and Means rescinded by order of the Speaker. |
2017-04-14 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. |
2017-04-11 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-04-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to Higher Education and Workforce Development with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2017-03-02 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |