OR HB3289 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits distribution of list of electors that indicates whether elector cast ballot in election until day after date of election.
Title
Relating to lists of electors.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike McLane [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-07-03 | House | Motion to withdraw from Rules failed. Ayes, 24; Nays, 32--Bailey, Barker, Barton, Boone, Clem, Dembrow, Doherty, Fagan, Frederick, Gallegos, Garrett, Gelser, Gomberg, Gorsek, Greenlick, Harker, Holvey, Hoyle, Keny-Guyer, Komp, Lively, Matthews, McKeown, Nathanson, Read, Reardon, Tomei, Unger, Vega Pederson, Williamson, Witt, Speaker Kotek; Excused, 2--Krieger, Weidner; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Barnhart, Buckley. |
2013-03-04 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2013-02-25 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |