OR HB3284 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 305, (2021 Laws): Effective date June 15, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 305, (2021 Laws): Effective date June 15, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits covered organization from collecting, using or disclosing personal health data about resident individual who has not given affirmative express consent for collection, use or disclosure unless in context of employment relationship or to comply with legal obligation, or unless personal health data was lawfully available to public from federal, state or local government records, was collected before emergency period for reasons other than tracking, monitoring or tracing resident individual's exposure to or infection by SARS-CoV-2 or COVID-19 or has been deidentified in accordance with federal law. Prohibits covered organization from collecting, using or disclosing personal health data about resident individual who has not given affirmative express consent for collection, use or disclosure unless in context of employment relationship or to comply with legal obligation, or unless personal health data was lawfully available to public from federal, state or local government records, was collected before emergency period for reasons other than tracking, monitoring or tracing resident individual's exposure to or infection by SARS-CoV-2 or COVID-19 or has been deidentified in accordance with federal law. Prohibits covered organization from retaining, storing or using personal health data and requires covered organization to destroy, delete or render inaccessible personal health data not later than specified dates unless personal health data consists of aggregations, statistical analyses, compilations or interpretations and covered organization takes reasonable measures to ensure that personal health data does not and cannot personally identify resident individual] deidentifies personal health data in accordance with federal law. Requires covered organization to collect, receive or use] collect, use, receive, process, examine, disclose or collate only personal health data only for specified purposes] that is reasonably necessary to provide services to resident individual and to provide resident individual with certain disclosures and ability to revoke affirmative express consent for collection, receipt or use of personal health data except in specified circumstances. Punishes violation of Act as unlawful trade practice. Sunsets Act 270 days after COVID-19 emergency period, as defined in Act, ends. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to protecting the privacy of the personal health data of residents of this state; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Holvey [D] | Rep. Pam Marsh [D] | Rep. Jeff Reardon [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 305, (2021 Laws): Effective date June 15, 2021. |
2021-06-15 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Boquist, Heard. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Gelser, Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 20; Nays, 9--Boquist, Findley, Girod, Heard, Johnson, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Gorsek. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-27 | House | Third reading. Carried by Holvey. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 4--Hudson, Leif, Nearman, Smith G. |
2021-04-26 | House | Second reading. |
2021-04-20 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-04-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-29 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-24 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-22 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-02 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2021-02-23 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |