OR HB3275 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 466, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 466, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts land owned by eligible covenant holder that is burdened by affordable housing covenant, requiring affordability for at least 99 years, from ad valorem property taxation if improvements on land constitute owner-occupied housing. Exempts land owned by eligible covenant holder that is burdened by affordable housing covenant, requiring permanent] affordability for at least 99 years, from ad valorem property taxation if improvements on land constitute owner-occupied housing. Provides that 27 percent of real market] assessed value of owner-occupied condominium unit burdened by affordable housing covenant, requiring permanent] affordability for at least 99 years, is exempt from ad valorem property taxation. Allows exception to occupancy requirements for period of construction or rehabilitation of seven years, with three-year extension available. Provides clawback of property tax benefits for up to five years in cases where use or enforcement requirements are not complied with. Requires annual claim to be filed with county assessor. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to permanently affordable owner-occupied housing; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Khanh Pham [D] | Sen. Wlnsvey Campos [D] | Rep. Julianne Fahey [D] | Sen. Mark Meek [D] |
Sen. Kayse Jama [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the B-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Revenue by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the B-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Revenue by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 466, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021. |
2021-07-14 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-22 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Findley. Passed. Ayes, 24; Nays, 4--Heard, Linthicum, Robinson, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Kennemer, Manning Jr. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-06-01 | House | Third reading. Carried by Pham. Passed. Ayes, 42; Nays, 17--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Drazan, Leif, Levy, Moore-Green, Morgan, Nearman, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Stark, Wallan, Wright; Excused, 1--Evans. |
2021-05-28 | House | Carried over to June 1, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-05-27 | House | Second reading. |
2021-05-25 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2021-05-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-06 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-07 | House | Referred to Revenue by prior reference. |
2021-04-07 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Revenue by prior reference. |
2021-04-06 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-25 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-26 | House | Referred to Housing with subsequent referral to Revenue. |
2021-02-23 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |