OR HB3273 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes statewide audio newspaper service for persons who are blind or print-disabled.
Title
Relating to audio newspaper services for persons with disabilities; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-04-10 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-04 | House | Referred to Human Services and Housing with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2013-02-25 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |