OR HB3269 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of Environmental Quality to study and develop strategies to fund department's emergency response program. Directs Department of Environmental Quality to study and develop strategies to fund department's emergency response program. Directs department to provide update on progress of study to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to environment no later than January 15, 2022. Directs department to provide final report on study and recommendations for legislation to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to environment no later than June 15, 2022. Sunsets January 2, 2023. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to emergency response program funding; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Zach Hudson [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - House - House Committee Do pass. Refer to Ways and Means (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-04-10 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2021-04-10 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-04-07 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-31 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-02 | House | Referred to Energy and Environment. |
2021-02-23 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |